Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Carozza, Carter, Corderman, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Ellis, Feldman, Ferguson, Griffith, Guzzone, Hayes, Hester, Hettleman, Jackson, Kagan, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, Lee, McCray, Patterson, Peters, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Salling, Simonaire, Smith, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, Washington, West, Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing certain financing during fiscal years 2021 and 2022 for the purpose of relieving the adverse effects of the coronavirus pandemic; allowing, for certain taxable years, a subtraction under the Maryland income tax for certain unemployment insurance benefits; allowing, for certain taxable years, a subtraction under the Maryland income tax for certain coronavirus relief payments received by a person during the taxable year; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0612
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {119837/1
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Committee Amendment {119837/1 Adopted
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {519631/1 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means Economic Matters
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {295660/1 Adopted
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {173722/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Withdrawn
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {973228/1
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {973228/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
11AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {925969/1 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
11AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
11AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (130-1)
Proceedings
11AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-1)
Proceedings
11AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
11AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
11AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments {119837/1 6 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 6 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments 7 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Committee Amendment {119837/1 Adopted 7 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 7 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Floor Amendment {519631/1 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 7 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 7 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Referred Ways and Means Economic Matters 9 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments {295660/1 Adopted 11 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Floor Amendment {173722/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Withdrawn 11 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Floor Committee Amendment {973228/1 11 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 11 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Floor Committee Amendment {973228/1 Withdrawn 11AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Floor Amendment {925969/1 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 11AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 11AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (130-1) 11AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Third Reading Passed (130-1) 11AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 11AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 11AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act
Post Passage 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Text - Chapter - Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:15 PM
Click to return on the top page