Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission to Review Maryland's Use of Assessments and Testing in Public Schools
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Astle, Benson, Brochin, Conway, Currie, Eckardt, Edwards, Feldman, Guzzone, Jennings, Kagan, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Montgomery, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Reilly, Rosapepe, Waugh, Young, Bates, Salling, and Simonaire
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission to Review Maryland's Use of Assessments and Testing in Public Schools; requiring the State Department of Education to survey and assess specified data relating to local, State and federally mandated assessments; requiring the Department to report specified results to the State Board of Education, each county board of education, specified educational organizations, and specified legislative committees on or before August 31, 2015; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0452
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {864533/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {535564/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Senators Pinsky, Rosapepe, and Salling
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Delegates A. Washington, Shoemaker, and Ebersole
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {864533/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Favorable with Amendments {535564/1 Report Adopted 59
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) 60
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 59
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Senate Requests House Recede 59
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 59
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Senators Pinsky, Rosapepe, and Salling 59
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 House Refuses to Recede 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Delegates A. Washington, Shoemaker, and Ebersole 63
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 67
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM