Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Statewide Accounting of Sexual Assault Evidence Kits
Sponsored by
Senators Montgomery, Benson, Ferguson, Hough, Kagan, Kelley, Madaleno, Zirkin, Gladden, Brochin, Cassilly, Lee, Muse, Norman, Ramirez, Raskin, and Ready
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a specified law enforcement agency or other State or local agency to conduct an inventory of specified sexual assault kit evidence on or before January 1, 2016; requiring a specified agency to prepare a report regarding untested sexual assault evidence collection kits on or before March 1, 2016; requiring the report to be submitted to the Attorney General; and requiring the Attorney General to prepare and submit to the General Assembly a specified report and specified recommendations on or before December 1, 2016.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0462
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {248377/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-3)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {248377/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 First Reading Judiciary 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/26/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 57
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Second Reading Passed 57
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Third Reading Passed (135-3) 58
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Returned Passed 55
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM