Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senators Hayes, Benson, Elfreth, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, King, Lam, Lee, Patterson, Peters, Smith, Waldstreicher, Washington, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program; providing for the manner in which the Program is to be administered; providing for the powers and duties of the Secretary of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation under the Program; requiring, beginning on January 1, 2020, certain employees to pay the Secretary certain contributions; requiring, beginning on July 1, 2021, an individual to meet certain conditions to be eligible for benefits; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8.3-101 through 8.3-901, 8-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM