Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Nursing - Licensure by Endorsement - Clinical Experience
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that specified applicants for license by endorsement are required to have a specified active unencumbered license; requiring specified applicants to submit specified applications and specified evidence of active nursing practice to the State Board of Nursing and submit to specified criminal history records checks; authorizing the Board to waive specified clinical experience requirements under specified circumstances; authorizing the Board to deny licenses to specified applicants; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0624
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {294839/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments {294839/1 Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 46
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM