Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund – Purpose, Use, and Funding – Alterations
Sponsored by
Senators Edwards, Astle, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, Serafini, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 698
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the purpose and use of the State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund to include State-managed lakes; requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2020 and each fiscal year thereafter, to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $1,000,000 to the Fund; and requiring the Department of Natural Resources to report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 21, 2021 on the status of the Fund, money expended, costs incurred in administration, and recommendations for the Fund; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0801
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {840117/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 698
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund – Purpose, Use, and Funding – Alterations
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed 45
Text - Third - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund – Purpose, Use, and Funding – Alterations
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 47
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 46
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments {840117/1 Adopted 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund – Purpose, Use, and Funding – Alterations
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 698
Text - Chapter - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund – Purpose, Use, and Funding – Alterations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-205, 8-206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM