Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Administration and Funding
Sponsored by
Senators Griffith and Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Transferring oversight of the Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants from the Office of Student Financial Assistance within the Maryland Higher Education Commission to the Maryland Department of Health; requiring the Department, by October 1, 2021, and each October 1 thereafter, to submit a report to the General Assembly on the number of eligible physicians and physician assistants who applied for and participated in the Program that includes certain information; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0998
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Administration and Funding
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-1701, 24-1701 through 24-1706, 24-1702, 24-1704, 24-1705, 24-1706, 24-1707 )
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 3:11 PM