Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Racial and Ethnic Health Disparities
Sponsored by
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 499
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each health occupations board established under the Health Occupations Article to report an update on specified efforts to educate specified individuals regarding racial and ethnic health disparities to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2018.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {414733/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Occupations Boards - Racial and Ethnic Health Disparities
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {686783/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Health Occupations Boards - Racial and Ethnic Health Disparities
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 499
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Health Occupations Boards - Racial and Ethnic Health Disparities
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Health Occupations Boards - Racial and Ethnic Health Disparities - Information Campaigns - Reporting
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {414733/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations Boards - Racial and Ethnic Health Disparities
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {686783/1 Adopted 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Health Occupations Boards - Racial and Ethnic Health Disparities
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 499
Text - Chapter - Health Occupations Boards - Racial and Ethnic Health Disparities
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page