Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption - Agricultural Tourism
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing Anne Arundel County or a municipal corporation in Anne Arundel County to exempt from the admissions and amusement tax gross receipts from any admissions and amusement charges for any activities related to agricultural tourism.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0624
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption - Agricultural Tourism
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM