Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Feasibility of and Impact on Small and Minority Businesses in Maryland Conducting Business Internationally
Sponsored by
Senator Robinson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Feasibility of and Impact on Small and Minority Businesses in Maryland Conducting Business Internationally; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding the challenges of and the opportunities for small and minority businesses engaged in international business, and the feasibility of partnerships between small and minority businesses in Maryland and businesses in other countries; requiring the Task Force to report to the General Assembly by December 31, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Task Force to Study the Feasibility of and Impact on Small and Minority Businesses in Maryland Conducting Business Internationally
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM