Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Eligibility
Sponsored by
Senator Peters
Status
In the Senate - Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "national capital region" for the purposes of the National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program; requiring in fiscal years 2022 and 2023, that 75% of the National Capital Strategic Economic Development Fund to be used for community enhancement projects in sustainable communities located within the boundary of Interstate 495 in the State and the District of Columbia; and requiring in fiscal year 2024 that 100% of the Fund be used for enhancement projects in certain sustainable communities.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1253
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Eligibility
Senate 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation 6 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/11/2021 4:15 PM
Click to return on the top page