Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - Fully Online Distance Education Programs - Regulation
Sponsored by
Senator Pinsky
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the type of institution that is required to register with the Maryland Higher Education Commission before enrolling Maryland students in fully online distance education programs; exempting institutions of higher education that participate in the Southern Regional Education Board's Electronic Campus from the requirement to register with the Commission; requiring the Commission to peruse specified federal databases and information sources to make determinations; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {144534/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {884660/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (129-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {144534/1 Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Appropriations 51
House 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable with Amendments {884660/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (129-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-202, 11-202.1, 11-202.2, 11-202.3, 11-203, 11-204, 24-707 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM