Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Time for Filing
Sponsored by
Senator Norman
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the prohibition on the filing of a petition for expungement based on an acquittal, a dismissal, or a nolle prosequi within a specified period; and requiring specified records that are ordered for expungement to be expunged by removing the records to a separate secured area to which persons who do not have a legitimate reason for access are denied access.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0215 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Nolle Prosequi
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {948271/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Time for Filing
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Nolle Prosequi
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {948271/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Time for Filing
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Referred Judiciary 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page