Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Currie, Edwards, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Peters, and Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 9:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Correctional Officers' Retirement System to include certain individuals serving in certain positions in the Department of Juvenile Services; providing that certain members of the Correctional Officers' Retirement System who meet certain criteria may receive a normal service retirement allowance that is based on certain creditable service; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 9:30 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM