Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions – Active Duty Service Members – Electronic Deposition and Testimony
Sponsored by
Senators Waugh, Astle, Bates, Currie, Eckardt, Hough, Klausmeier, Manno, Mathias, Peters, Salling, Simonaire, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a party to a civil action who is entitled to protections under the federal Service Members Civil Relief Act due to the party's active duty status to petition the court to be deposed or to testify under penalty of perjury by certain electronic means; requiring a tribunal of the State to cooperate with other tribunals or the appropriate military representative in designating an appropriate location for the deposition or testimony under the Act; providing for the application of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1585
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Civil Actions – Active Duty Service Members – Electronic Deposition and Testimony
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM