Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining
Sponsored by
Cecil County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a full-time sworn correctional deputy sheriff in the Office of the Sheriff of Cecil County at the rank of lieutenant and below to take part in or refrain from taking part in forming, joining, supporting, or participating in a labor organization and certain activities relating to the labor organization for the purpose of engaging in collective bargaining with the Sheriff and the County Executive of Cecil County; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0540
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Contingency - on enactment of another bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-7)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable Adopted 39
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed 39
Text - Third - Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Appropriations 43
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (132-7) 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Text - Chapter - Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM