Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Beidle, Benson, Feldman, Hayes, Klausmeier, Kramer, Pinsky, Reilly, West, Young, Augustine, Hershey, and Jennings
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland to study access to dental services for all State residents, identify areas lacking in dental services for a significant number of people, identify barriers to receiving services, analyze the impact of barriers, assess options to eliminate barriers, and make recommendations on methods to increase access to dental services; requiring the Task Force to submit an interim report by May 1, 2021, and a final report by December 1, 2021, to certain committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0431 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {527574/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments {527574/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:08 PM
Click to return on the top page