Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Identification Badge
Sponsored by
Senators Montgomery, Benson, Forehand, Madaleno, Peters, Pinsky, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 491
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that specified health care practitioners, when providing health care to a patient, wear a badge or other identification displaying specified information; providing for exceptions; authorizing each health occupations board to adopt regulations; authorizing the regulations to provide exemptions or allow use of a first name only; providing that a violation may be reported to a specified health occupations board; authorizing a health occupations board to send letters in response to reported violations; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1356
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {754938/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {696684/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 491
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {754938/1 Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 51
House 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2013 4/06/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable with Amendments {696684/1 Report Adopted 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 491
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM