Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Compensation
Sponsored by
Senators Waugh, Astle, Bates, Cassilly, Currie, Eckardt, Hough, Klausmeier, Manno, Mathias, Peters, Salling, Simonaire, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from $15,000 to $22,500, the amount of a certain subtraction modification under the State income tax for certain military compensation attributable to active service outside the United States; reducing the subtraction by a certain amount if the amount of compensation received by the individual exceeds $22,500; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Compensation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Compensation
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM