Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Food Stamp Program - Time Limit Waiver - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State from applying for or implementing a federal waiver of the time limit on the receipt of benefits under the food stamp program by an able-bodied adult without dependents who does not meet certain work requirements.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1273
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Food Stamp Program - Time Limit Waiver - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Food Stamp Program - Time Limit Waiver - Prohibition
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Unfavorable Report by Finance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM