Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Public Accountancy - Firm Permits - Attest Services
Sponsored by
Senators Ellis, Feldman, Klausmeier, Patterson, Peters, Serafini, Young, and Carozza
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a provision of law that requires a certified public accountant firm to hold a permit issued by the State Board of Public Accountancy if the firm performs certain attest services for a client with a home office in this State; and authorizing a certain firm that does not have an office in this State to perform certain attest services for a certain client in this State without a permit issued by the Board under certain circumstances.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1081
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Public Accountancy - Firm Permits - Attest Services
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {484632/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Board of Public Accountancy - Firm Permits - Attest Services
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Board of Public Accountancy - Firm Permits - Attest Services
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board of Public Accountancy - Firm Permits - Attest Services
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {484632/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Public Accountancy - Firm Permits - Attest Services
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Referred Economic Matters 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Text - Chapter - State Board of Public Accountancy - Firm Permits - Attest Services
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page