Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Augustine, Carter, Hettleman, Kelley, Lee, and Pinsky
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a hospital to submit annually a certain report to the Health Services Cost Review Commission at a certain time; requiring the Commission to post certain information on its website; altering the required contents of a hospital's policy on the collection of debts owed by patients; requiring a hospital to provide a refund of certain amounts collected from a patient or the guarantor of a patient who was found eligible for reduced-cost care on the date of service; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0565
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/1/2021 4:18 PM
Click to return on the top page