Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Career and Technology Education and Workforce Investment Act
Sponsored by
Senators Currie, Rosapepe, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Manno, Mathias, Middleton, Peters, Ramirez, Smith, Young, McFadden, and Muse
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. (Appropriations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Career and Technology Education Grant Program to provide grants for the capital equipping of school facilities used to provide a certain career and technology program; requiring the Interagency Committee on School Construction to implement and administer the Program; requiring the Interagency Committee to award certain grants to county boards of education and to develop application procedures and eligibility requirements under the Program; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1098
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Career and Technology Education and Workforce Investment Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {699338/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {903824/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Career and Technology Education and Workforce Investment Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Appropriations Ways and Means
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Career and Technology Education and Workforce Investment Act
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {699338/1 Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Floor Amendment {903824/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Career and Technology Education and Workforce Investment Act
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Appropriations Ways and Means 43
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. (Appropriations)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-314 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM