Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Career Apprenticeship Investment Act
Sponsored by
Senators Rosapepe, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Peters, Ramirez, Robinson, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. (Appropriations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Governor to provide an additional $2,000,000 annually, in addition to the $1,000,000 annual appropriation, to the Maryland Higher Education Commission for Workforce Development Sequence Scholarships; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to create a statewide media campaign to promote participation in career and technical education, apprenticeships, and workforce development in workforce shortage occupations in the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1226
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018, October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Career Apprenticeship Investment Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {537274/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Career Apprenticeship Investment Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Appropriations Economic Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Career Apprenticeship Investment Act
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {537274/1 Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Career Apprenticeship Investment Act
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Appropriations Economic Matters 43
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. (Appropriations)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-1905.2, 18-3303 )
(   10-742 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM