Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals
Sponsored by
Senators Young and Hough
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a prohibition in Frederick County against hunting or attempting to hunt nongame birds and mammals without first obtaining a hunting license.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0655
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Frederick County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Frederick County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-5)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Frederick County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Frederick County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable Adopted 33
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Second Reading Passed 33
Text - Third - Frederick County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 35
House 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 38
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (132-5) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Text - Chapter - Frederick County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:35 AM