Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health – Behavioral Health Programs and Health Care Facilities – Safety and Community Relations Plans
Sponsored by
Senators McCray, Ellis, Ferguson, Hayes, and Kelley
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that the regulations adopted by the Behavioral Health Administration under certain provisions of law governing requirements for the licensure of behavioral health programs include a requirement that a behavioral health program establish and implement a safety plan for the safety of the individuals served by behavioral health program before being issued a license; requiring a behavioral health program to establish and implement a community relations plan under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {817571/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Health - Behavioral Health Programs and Health Care Facilities - Safety Plan
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {817571/1 Adopted 35
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Public Health – Behavioral Health Programs and Health Care Facilities – Safety and Community Relations Plans
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 37
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 38
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-150, 19-2301, 7.5-402 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:09 PM