Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Montgomery, Nathan-Pulliam, Raskin, Ready, and Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that, in a prosecution for a specified charge relating to prostitution, it is an affirmative defense of duress if the defendant committed the act as a result of being a victim of an act of another who was charged with violating the human trafficking law; and providing that a defendant intending on asserting the affirmative defense is required to provide the State's Attorney with a specified notice at least 10 days prior to trial.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {538178/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {552312/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (120-18)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/12/2015 3/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments {538178/1 Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 45
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 First Reading Judiciary 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable with Amendments {552312/1 Report Adopted 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 69
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (120-18) 70
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM