Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements - Children and Young Adults - Report Modifications
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the Director of the Behavioral Health Administration's annual report on behavioral health services for children and young adults in the State include certain information relating to outpatient and substance-related disorders program services by children and young adults and behavioral health services provided through telehealth; altering the scope of certain data required to be included in the report; requiring that certain data in the report be grouped by race and ethnicity; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1243
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2021
Legislative Date
1/31/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements - Children and Young Adults - Report Modifications
Senate 1/31/2021 1/31/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 4:09 PM
Click to return on the top page