Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Poultry Litter Energy-Generating Cooperative Program
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Hershey, Mathias, Middleton, Montgomery, Simonaire, and Colburn
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Poultry Litter Energy-Generating Cooperative Program; prohibiting the rates and structure of the Program from being used for distributed generation from other sources of energy; requiring the Public Service Commission to consult with the Maryland Energy Administration on administration of the Program; requiring that the Commission determine whether an energy-generating cooperative applicant meets requirements; requiring the Commission to adopt regulations; providing for the allocation of unsubscribed energy; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1076
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {757979/1
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Laid Over (Senator Colburn) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {757979/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Colburn) {703820/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {803098/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 3/14/2014 3/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments {757979/1 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Laid Over (Senator Colburn) Adopted 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments {757979/1 Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Colburn) {703820/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 49
House 3/21/2014 3/18/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/04/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {803098/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) 67
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM