Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick Regional Higher Education Advisory Board
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Frederick Regional Higher Education Advisory Board; providing for the composition, appointment, and terms of the Board members; providing for a chair of the Board and the establishment of committees; prohibiting Board members from receiving compensation but entitling Board members to reimbursement for specified expenses; providing for the powers and duties of the Board; authorizing the Board to apply, accept, and expend specified gifts, appropriations, or grants; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0527
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {514431/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/25 (Senator Brinkley) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Brinkley) Adopted (26-17)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (26-15)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) {543722/1
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Brinkley) Rejected (16-28)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) Withdrawn
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {514431/1 Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Special Order until 3/25 (Senator Brinkley) Adopted 50
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Brinkley) Adopted (26-17) 52
Senate 3/27/2013 3/23/2013 Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (26-15) 54
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) {543722/1 58
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Brinkley) Rejected (16-28) 58
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) Withdrawn 58
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 59
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 60
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-1001 through 24-1004 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM