Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Funds Transfers
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the applicability of provisions of the Maryland Uniform Commercial Code governing funds transfers; providing that the provisions apply to a specified remittance transfer except under specified circumstances; and establishing that, in the event of an inconsistency between an applicable provision of the Maryland Uniform Commercial Code governing funds transfers and an applicable provision of the federal Electronic Fund Transfer Act, the federal law governs to the extent of the inconsistency.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0564
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 26
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Second Reading Passed 26
Senate 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 28
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 31
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 59
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 60
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4A-101, 4A-102, 4A-104, 4A-108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM