Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Beidle, Benson, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Feldman, Ferguson, Griffith, Guzzone, Hayes, Hershey, Jennings, Kagan, King, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, Lee, Patterson, Pinsky, Reilly, Rosapepe, Serafini, Washington, West, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council; repealing the requirement that the Secretary of Health and the Secretary of Aging, or their designees, cochair the Council; requiring the members of the Council to select the chair; requiring the Council to update a certain plan, examine the needs of individuals with Alzheimer's disease and identify methods to meet those needs, provide certain advice to the Governor and the General Assembly, and develop and promote certain strategies; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0571
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {217071/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {106089/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments {217071/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments {106089/1 Adopted 53AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Text - Chapter - Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions
(   13-3201 through 13-3203, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207 )
(   2013, 2016 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page