Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in Maryland
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman and Glassman
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in Maryland; providing for the composition, to include one member each from the Senate and House of Delegates of Maryland, cochairs, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {944239/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {944239/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 68
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM