Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Telemedicine – Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners and Psychiatrists
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health, under certain circumstances, to include psychiatric nurse practitioners who are providing Assertive Community Treatment or mobile treatment services to certain Maryland Medical Assistance Program recipients in the types of providers eligible to receive reimbursement for health care services that are delivered through telemedicine and provided to Program recipients; terminating the Act after September 30, 2021; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0605
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {547771/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telemedicine - Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments {547771/1 Adopted 54
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Telemedicine – Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners and Psychiatrists
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 55
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 55
House 4/01/2019 4/02/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
Text - Chapter - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Telemedicine – Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners and Psychiatrists
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-105.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM