Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Benson, Hough, King, Lee, Montgomery, and Ramirez
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an agency that is participating in a child abuse or neglect investigation and that has reasonable grounds to believe that a person has failed to report child abuse as required under a specified provision of law to file a specified complaint with a specified board, agency, institution, or facility.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1146
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 40
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Second Reading Passed 40
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42
House 3/16/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Judiciary 43A
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-705.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM