Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Credit Regulation - Unsecured Open End Credit Plans - Fees and Charges
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 723
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that specified fees and charges permitted to be imposed on a consumer borrower under an unsecured open end credit plan, when combined with any interest charged under the plan, may not exceed an effective rate of 33% per annum simple interest; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1270
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Credit Regulation - Unsecured Open End Credit Plans - Fees and Charges
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Credit Regulation - Unsecured Open End Credit Plans - Fees and Charges
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-5)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Davis) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 723
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Credit Regulation - Unsecured Open End Credit Plans - Fees and Charges
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed 55
Text - Third - Credit Regulation - Unsecured Open End Credit Plans - Fees and Charges
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (40-5) 56
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 61
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Davis) Adopted 68
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 69
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 723
Text - Chapter - Credit Regulation - Unsecured Open End Credit Plans - Fees and Charges
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-905 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM