Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Southern Maryland Carousel Project
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $250,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Southern Maryland Carousel Group, Inc. for specified development or improvement purposes related to the Southern Maryland Carousel, located in Charles County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; establishing a deadline for the encumbrance or expenditure of the loan proceeds; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0509
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 4:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/08 at 4:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/28/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM