Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Manufacturers - Notice to Purchasers and Lessees - Warranty Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a motor vehicle manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch to provide a certain notice of warranty requirements to the purchaser or lessee of a new motor vehicle within 90 days after the purchase or lease of the motor vehicle.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0434
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {357577/1
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Manno) Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {357577/1
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Ramirez) Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Manufacturers - Notice to Purchasers and Lessees - Warranty Requirements
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Reassigned to Finance 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments {357577/1 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Manno) Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable with Amendments {357577/1 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Ramirez) Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
(   15-210.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page