Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Astle, Feldman, Guzzone, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, Oaks, Reilly, Rosapepe, and Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each administrator of a hospital to make a certain patient bill of rights easily accessible to all patients and visitors; requiring each administrator of a hospital to offer to patients a certain patient's bill of rights; requiring each administrator of a hospital to provide certain patients with a translator, an interpreter, or another accommodation to provide certain assistance to patients; specifying the content of the rights that are required to be addressed in a patient's bill of rights; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0562
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {737674/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {173723/1 (Senator Young)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {173723/1 (Senator Young) Withdrawn
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {653325/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-7)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
43AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {737674/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Floor Amendment {173723/1 (Senator Young) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Floor Amendment {173723/1 (Senator Young) Withdrawn 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Floor Amendment {653325/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Third Reading Passed (36-7) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 43AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page