Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Feldman, Kelley, King, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Pinsky, Pugh, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing specified criminal and civil prohibitions against the use and possession of marijuana; establishing specified exemptions from prosecution for specified persons for using, obtaining, purchasing, transporting, or possessing marijuana under specified circumstances; establishing exemptions from prosecution for specified retailers, marijuana product manufacturers, marijuana cultivation facilities, and safety compliance facilities under specified circumstances; establishing a specified affirmative defense; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0911
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1201 through 5-1232, 5-601, 5-620 )
(   12.5-101 through 12.5-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM