Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Reform
Sponsored by
Senators McFadden, Kelley, and Muse
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing specified provisions that provide that inmates serving a term of life imprisonment may be paroled only with the Governor's approval, subject to specified provisions; repealing specified provisions that require specified parole decisions to be transmitted to the Governor under specified circumstances; repealing specified provisions that authorize the Governor to disapprove specified parole decisions in a specified manner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0882
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0111 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-305, 7-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM