Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Financial Aid - In-State Students (The Jill Wrigley Memorial Scholarship Expansion Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Conway, Currie, Kagan, King, Lee, Manno, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, Zucker, Ferguson, and Nathan-Pulliam
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 813
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making individuals who are eligible for in-State financial aid eligible for a Delegate Howard P. Rawlings Educational Excellence Award and part-time grants.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0420
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {614734/1
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {614734/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-16)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Morgan) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {933321/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (50-86)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {333029/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (50-81)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (86-48)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 813
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Higher Education - Financial Aid - In-State Students (The Jill Wrigley Memorial Scholarship Expansion Act)
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments {614734/1 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {614734/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Financial Aid - In-State Students (The Jill Wrigley Memorial Scholarship Expansion Act)
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (31-16) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Ways and Means 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Morgan) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Floor Amendment {933321/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (50-86) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Floor Amendment {333029/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (50-81) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Third Reading Passed (86-48) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 813
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Financial Aid - In-State Students (The Jill Wrigley Memorial Scholarship Expansion Act)
(   18-1401, 18-1401.1, 18-303, 18-303.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page