Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Bay Tax Equity Act
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Lee, Manno, Montgomery, Pinsky, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a specified chicken manure pollution fee payable to the Comptroller by a specified poultry integrator in a specified manner; requiring the Comptroller to transfer revenue from the fee to the Maryland Agriculture Water Quality Cost Share Program in the Department of Agriculture for specified cover crop activities; repealing specified provisions of law requiring the Comptroller to disburse specified funds from the Bay Restoration Fund to be used for specified cover crop activities; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0886
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0725 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/10/2015 Text - First - Bay Tax Equity Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-704.3 )
(   9-1605.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM