Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Preventing or Interfering with Report of Suspected Child Abuse or Neglect
Sponsored by
Senator Shank
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an individual from preventing or interfering with the making of a specified report of suspected child abuse or neglect; and making a violation of the Act a misdemeanor punishable by imprisonment not exceeding 5 years or a fine not exceeding $10,000 or both.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0631
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 51
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 First Reading Judiciary 52
House 3/23/2013 3/23/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-704, 5-705.1, 5-705.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM