Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Information Act - Denial of Part of a Public Record - Victims and Witnesses
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan and Reilly
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining "contrary to the public interest" for the purposes of a certain provision of law authorizing a custodian to deny inspection of a part of a public record because the custodian believes the inspection would reveal the identity of a victim or a witness; defining the term "witness" for the purposes of certain provisions of the Act relating to inspections of part of a 9-1-1 communications record; and requiring a custodian to take certain actions before granting inspection of the part of a 9-1-1 communications record; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1619
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Information Act - Denial of Part of a Public Record - Victims and Witnesses
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Information Act - Denial of Part of a Public Record - Victims and Witnesses
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 38 Click to view Recorded Media
(   4-343, 4-356 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:09 PM
Click to return on the top page