Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Modifications
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Kelley, Mathias, Middleton, Pugh, and Reilly
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Requiring that specified authorized providers be registered with the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program before obtaining a new or renewal controlled dangerous substance registration; requiring that specified prescribers be registered with the Program before obtaining a new or renewal registration or by July 1, 2017, whichever is sooner; authorizing the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to identify and publish a list of monitored prescription drugs with a low potential for abuse; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0437
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {967176/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {406283/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-1)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/18/2017 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Favorable with Amendments {967176/1 Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 52
House 3/28/2016 3/23/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 55A
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {406283/1 Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-1) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Passed Enrolled 63A
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-304 )
(   21-2A-01, 21-2A-02, 21-2A-03, 21-2A-04, 21-2A-04.1, 21-2A-04.2, 21-2A-04.3, 21-2A-05, 21-2A-06, 21-2A-07, 21-2A-08, 21-2A-09 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM