Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public School Construction - Regulations - Equitable Distribution of Projects and Improvements
Sponsored by
Senator Salling
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Public Works, at the recommendation of the Interagency Committee on School Construction, to adopt specified regulations that require each local school system to use a specified method for determining funding requests for public school construction projects and public school capital improvements that will result in an equitable distribution of projects and improvements in each legislative district within the geographical boundary of the local school system.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Public School Construction - Regulations - Equitable Distribution of Projects and Improvements
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM