Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Distribution of Controlled Dangerous Substances - Fentanyl
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Jennings, Ready, Salling, Serafini, and Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 569
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from knowingly distributing a specified mixture of controlled dangerous substances; establishing specified penalties for a violation of the Act; and requiring a sentence for the distribution of a mixture of specified controlled dangerous substances to be consecutive to any other sentence imposed.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0687
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Distribution of Opioids Resulting in Death
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {498670/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-8)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 569
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Criminal Law - Distribution of Opioids Resulting in Death
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {498670/1 Adopted 43
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Distribution of Controlled Dangerous Substances - Fentanyl
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 44
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Judiciary 46
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (132-8) 69
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 569
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Distribution of Controlled Dangerous Substances - Fentanyl
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-602, 5-608.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM