Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Cybersecurity Council - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Edwards, Feldman, Guzzone, Montgomery, Ramirez, Middleton, Astle, Benson, Hershey, Jennings, Kelley, Klausmeier, Mathias, Pugh, and Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Cybersecurity Council; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Council; prohibiting a member of the Council from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Council to work with specified entities to take specified actions related to cybersecurity; requiring the Council, beginning on July 1, 2017, and every 2 years thereafter, to submit a report on its activities to the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {507274/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {493797/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (124-13)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senators Astle, Jennings, and Feldman
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Delegates Kramer, A. Miller, and Frick
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments {507274/1 Report Adopted 46
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 First Reading Economic Matters 49
House 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments {493797/1 Report Adopted 60
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (124-13) 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senate Requests House Recede 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senators Astle, Jennings, and Feldman 63
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 House Refuses to Recede 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Delegates Kramer, A. Miller, and Frick 70
Senate 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendment 67
Senate 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 67
Senate 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM