Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on Procurement and Cybersecurity
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Feldman, Guzzone, Montgomery, and Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on Procurement and Cybersecurity; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to conduct a study and make recommendations regarding specified law, policies, procedures, and best practices that should be adopted by the State; requiring the Task Force to submit its recommendations to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on or before July 1, 2018; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/19/2015 2/20/2015 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM